VA SB716 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Medicine; unprofessional conduct. Prohibits the Board of Medicine from taking disciplinary action against a doctor based on the alleged provision or receipt of abortion care that is not prohibited under the laws of the Commonwealth, regardless of where such abortion care was provided or received. The bill also specifies that grounds for refusal to issue a certificate or license to any applicant or to take disciplinary action for procuring or performing an abortion apply to such action only as it is prohibited by the laws of the Commonwealth. Under current law, such grounds for refusal or disciplinary action apply for procuring or performing a criminal abortion.
Title
Unprofessional conduct; disciplinary action against doctor for providing abortion care, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB716ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (54-Y 45-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (14-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB716S1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106224D-S1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106224D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health Professions |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24104822D |
Same As/Similar To
HB519 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 10.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 225.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |