VA SB727 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; presumptions; members of the enforcement division of the Department of Motor Vehicles. Adds full-time sworn members of the enforcement division of the Department of Motor Vehicles to those public safety employees who are entitled to presumptions that hypertension, heart disease, and certain infectious diseases are occupational diseases compensable under the Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Workers' compensation; presumptions, members of enforcement division of DMV.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (10-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Worker's Compensation |
2012-12-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2012-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102378D |