VA SB739 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund. Expands the use of moneys in the Fund to include grants for the construction or build-out of privately owned buildings. The bill would also cap the aggregate amount of grants outÂstanding on or after July 1, 2010, at $30 million.
Title
Economic development incentives; aggregate amount of awarded grants for eligible projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Colgan [D] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Linda Puller [D] |
Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] | Sen. Walter Stosch [R] | Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (90-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 735 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB739ER) | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-13 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (90-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (90-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-11 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-03-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10105970D-ES1 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB739ES1 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105970D-S1 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read first time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105970D-S1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10105908D | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Introduced at the request of Governor |
Same As/Similar To
HB1396 (Same As) 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)