VA SB74 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate loans; flood insurance. Prohibits a lender from requiring a borrower to provide flood insurance coverage against risks to improvements on real property securing its loan in an amount that exceeds the replacement value of the improvements.
Title
Real estate loans; flood insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2014-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB74ER) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100621D |