VA SB754 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
Summary
Public-Private Transportation Act; tolls on Interstate highways. Prohibits a private entity from imposing tolls or user fees under the Public-Private Transportation Act on any existing rural segment of Interstate Route 81 without the prior approval of the General Assembly. This bill is identical to
Title
Public-Private Transportation Act; prohibits private entity from imposing tolls on Interstate 81.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. Mark Obenshain [R] |
Sen. Phillip Puckett [D] | Sen. Ralph Smith [R] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. William Wampler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838) | |
2008-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 838 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB754ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-04 | House: Delegates: Gilbert, Saxman, Brink | |
2008-03-04 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senators: Deeds, Obenshain, Edwards | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2008-02-28 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Passed House with substitute (91-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB754H1 | |
2008-02-25 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083560288-H1 | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 083560288-H1 | |
2008-02-21 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 2-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 4 | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB754S1 | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083520288-S1 | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083520288-S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 088873288 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1516 (Same As) 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB754 |