VA SB757 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pneumatic gun regulations. Prohibits a locality from adopting an ordinance that prohibits the shooting of pneumatic guns on private property, with permission of the owner of the property, if reasonable care is taken to prevent a projectile from crossing the bounds of the property. The bill also invalidates any existing local ordinances that conflict with the provisions of the act.
Title
Pneumatic guns; regulations, exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 16-N) (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 16-N) (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB757ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 2-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 2-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 16-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (77-Y 16-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB757ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House (78-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (17-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11100439D-E | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB757E | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (9-Y 6-N) | |
2010-12-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-12-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100439D |