VA SB780 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Home instruction or religious exemption; information disclosure. Provides that a division superintendent or local school board may disclose, to the extent provided by the written consent of a student's parent, certain information that is provided by a parent or student regarding the parent's election to provide home instruction in lieu of school attendance or the parent's claim of a religious exemption.
Title
Home instruction or religious exemption; information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 640 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB780ER) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104490D |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |