VA SB84 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care; independent living services. Extends the time during which a person who was in foster care on his eighteenth birthday and who has not reached the age of 21 years may request restoration of independent living services from 60 days to 180 days after the date on which independent living services were previously terminated. This bill is contingent upon an appropriation of General Funds effectuating the provisions of the bill.
Title
Foster care; extends option of independent living services to person between 18 and 21 years old.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12104789D-ES1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB84ES1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104789D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104789D-S1 | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100792D |