VA SB849 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lawn fertilizer contractor-applicators. Authorizes the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to enter into an agreement with a locality to provide oversight and data collection assistance related to the requirements of certified lawn fertilizer contractor-applicators. Current law prohibits localities from regulating the registration, packaging, labeling, sale, use, application, storage, or distribution of fertilizers except by ordinance pursuant to certain requirements. The bill also reduces from 100 to 50 the total number of acres of nonagricultural land to which a contractor-applicator may apply lawn fertilizer and lawn maintenance fertilizer annually without submitting an annual report to the Commissioner. The bill increases from $250 to $1,000 the civil penalty imposed on a contractor-applicator for a violation of applicable regulations.
Title
Lawn fertilizer; contractor-applicators.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 413 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB849ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102703D |