VA SB852 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pet shops; procurement of dogs from unlicensed dealers. Prohibits any companion animal dealer who is not licensed or exempted from licensure by the U.S. Department of Agriculture (USDA) from selling any dog to a pet shop. The bill prohibits a pet shop from procuring a dog from a person who has received citations for one critical violation or three or more noncritical violations from the USDA in the two years prior to receiving the dog. The bill prohibits a pet shop from selling a dog procured from someone who knowingly obtained the dog directly or indirectly from a person with such citations.
Title
Pet shops; procurement of dogs from unlicensed dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB852ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 17105435D-S1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB852H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105435D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105435D-H1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB852S1 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104008D-S1 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104008D-S1 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101303D |