VA SB855 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Defeated by Senate (12-Y 28-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Defeated by Senate (12-Y 28-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; small loans; penalty. Prohibits any person from making a small loan unless such person is licensed by the State Corporation Commission. The bill defines "small loan" as an unsecured loan or credit of $5,000 or less extended to a borrower for a personal, family, household, or other noncommercial purpose pursuant to a small loan agreement. The bill also prohibits any person from engaging in the business of arranging or brokering small loans for any consumer residing in the Commonwealth without registering with the Commission. Under the provisions of the bill, a licensee may charge and collect periodic interest at any rate up to 36 percent agreed to by the parties and may also charge and collect a customary daily fee. The bill provides exemptions for certain institutions and persons licensed by the Commission to provide consumer finance loans or motor vehicle loans.
Title
Financial institutions; small loans, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (12-Y 28-N) (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (7-Y 8-N) (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (7-Y 8-N) (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (12-Y 28-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB855S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106455D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106455D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reconsidered by Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (7-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104084D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 2 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 2228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 2253 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |