VA SB872 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Tethering animals; adequate shelter and space. Provides that outdoor tethering of a companion animal shall not meet the requirement that an animal be given adequate shelter, unless the animal is actively engaged in an agricultural or hunting activity, when it is conducted (i) when the temperature is 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower or 85 degrees Fahrenheit or higher; (ii) during a heat advisory; or (iii) during a severe weather warning. The bill provides that a tether shall meet the requirement that an animal be given adequate space if it is four times the length of the animal or 15 feet in length, whichever is greater, and does not cause injury or pain or weigh more than one-tenth of the animal's body weight. The bill exempts agricultural animals from existing provisions related to tethering. The bill also authorizes any locality to adopt ordinances that parallel and make more stringent the state law regarding the care of companion animals.
Title
Tethering animals; outdoor tethering of companion animals, definitions of adequate shelter and space
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB872S1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106458D-S1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 18106458D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106458D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104860D |