VA SB877 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads; membership. Adds four legislative members, two from each house, to the Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads. The bill provides that nonlegislative members shall have experience in at least one of the following fields: (i) transit planning, transportation planning, or land use planning; (ii) transit or transportation management or management of other public sector operations; (iii) public budgeting or finance; (iv) corporate communications; (v) government oversight; or (vi) local or state government.
Title
Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads; membership.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Failed to pass |
2018-03-10 | Senate | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Heretick, Knight, Davis |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: DeSteph, Cosgrove, Mason |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | House requested conference committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB877H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107410D-H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107410D-H1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB877S1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Cosgrove 18106350D-S1 agreed to |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18106350D-S1 (Cosgrove) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendments reconsidered (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105145D |