VA SB879 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Employee Misclassification Task Force. Establishes the Employee Misclassification Task Force to, among other things, develop and recommend legislation to provide a clear and consistent definition of "employee" to ensure conformance with relevant federal tax laws. The provisions of the bill shall expire on July 1, 2018.
Title
Employee Misclassification Task Force; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-02-01 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103229D |