VA SB899 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bumper stickers on school buses. Authorizes local school divisions to place decals on the rear of school buses noting that the buses stop at railroad crossings.
Title
School buses; local school boards may display certain decals on rear or sides of buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 778 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB899ER2) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB899ER) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-18 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13100593D-E |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB899E |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100593D |