VA SB921 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property conveyance. Authorizes the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to grant and convey a permanent easement and right-of-way across the bed of the Piankatank River and a permanent easement and right-of-way across the bed of the Narrows, including a portion of the Baylor Survey, to Virginia Electric and Power Company (Dominion Virginia Power), for the purpose of installing and operating a submarine electric distribution cable system. This is emergency legislation.
Title
Pianakatank River & Narrows; VMRC to convey easements for purpose of installing, etc. cable system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective 3/25/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB921ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-18 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB921S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104453D-S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104453D-S1 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102600D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors