VA SB93 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Correctional Officer Procedural Guarantee Act. Creates the Correctional Officer Procedural Guarantee Act to establish procedural guarantees for correctional officers when allegations are made against such officers involving matters that may lead to their dismissal, demotion, suspension, or transfer for punitive reasons.
Title
Correctional Officer Procedural Guarantee Act; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-29 | House | Continued to 2017 with amendment(s) in Appropriations by voice vote |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16102262D-E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB93E |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102262D |