VA SB940 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health screening of inmates at local correctional facilities. Requires that the staff of a local correctional facility screen persons admitted to the facility for mental illness using a scientifically validated instrument designated by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill provides that if the screening indicates that a person may have a mental illness, an assessment of his need for mental services shall be conducted within 72 hours of the time of the screening by a qualified mental health professional, which is defined in the bill. The bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services, in consultation with the State Board of Corrections and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to (i) ensure that local and regional correctional facilities are aware of the aforementioned requirements and (ii) develop and deliver a training program for employees of such facilities regarding the administration of such instrument. This bill incorporates SB 933.
Title
Mental health screening of prisoners at local correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] |
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB940S2 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104923D-S2 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 17104413D-S1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB933 (Favola) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104923D-S2 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104413D-S1 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Recommitted to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101438D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commonwealth Public Safety
Correctional Enterprises
Criminal Justice Services
Prisoners
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Commonwealth Public Safety
Correctional Enterprises
Criminal Justice Services
Prisoners
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction