VA SB953 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; services for individuals with Alzheimer's disease and related disorders. Expands the duties of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services related to services for individuals with Alzheimer's disease and related disorders and their caregivers.
Title
Aging and Rehabilitative Services, Department for; service for individuals with Alzheimer's disease.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 376 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB953ER) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101525D |