VA SB966 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Flavored nicotine vapor product; prohibition; penalty. Prohibits the sale or distribution at retail of a flavored nicotine product. The bill provides that any person who violates this prohibition is guilty of a Class 4 misdemeanor.
Title
Flavored nicotine vapor product; prohibition, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20108033D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB966ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Ebbin agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108033D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108033D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20102830D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 293.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |