VA SB967 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Extended foster care services and support. Creates the Extended Foster Care Services and Support Program to provide foster care services and support, including foster care maintenance payments, to qualifying individuals age 18 to 21 years who were formerly in the custody of a local board of social services.
Title
Extended Foster Care Services and Support Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101695D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 283.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 921 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |