VA SB983 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; common interest communities; powers of certain regulatory boards and programs. Extends the expiration deadline for provisional common interest community manager licenses from June 30, 2011, to June 30, 2012. The bill also (i) amends bonding requirements for associations whose residents are exempt from licensure by the Common Interest Community (CIC) Board to conform to the Condominium and Property Owners Association Acts, (ii) provides for the payment of court-appointed receivers from the Common Interest Community Management Recovery Fund, and (iii) clarifies the CIC Board's authority to promulgate regulations. In addition, the bill clarifies Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act and Condominium Act provisions governing the irrevocable appointment for service of process to apply only to nonresidents and corrects an erroneous reference contained in the Condominium Act. The bill has an emergency clause and incorporates
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; common interest communities, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 3/25/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB983ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-25 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Whipple, Vogel, Marsden | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Comstock, Oder, Bulova | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | House: House insisted on amendments | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB983S1 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104421D-S1 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Incorporates SB1244 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104421D-S1 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103472D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2347 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2353 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |