VA SB997 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Street construction. Allows localities to retain full performance guarantees until streets in a new development are accepted by the state agency, local government department or agency, or other public authority that is responsible for maintaining and operating such public facility.
Title
Street construction; no bond, escrow, etc., may be released until streets are accepted by agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB997S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104672D-S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104672D-S1 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102199D |