VA SJR198 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ198ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ198ER)
Summary
Celebrating and remembering the life and career of Kenneth McNabb Hicks.
Title
Celebrating and remembering the life and career of Kenneth McNabb Hicks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ198ER) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2008-02-28 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2008-02-28 | House: Received | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 089045300 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Presented 089045300 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ198 |