VA SJR278 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; local government fiscal stress; report. Establishes a 15-member joint subcommittee to study local government fiscal stress. The two-year joint subcommittee shall review (i) the taxing authorities of local governments, including the disparity between city and county tax authority; (ii) local responsibilities for service delivery of state-mandated or high priority programs, (iii) causes of fiscal stress among local governments, (iv) the current state tax system, including the future of the car tax; and (v) potential financial incentives and other governmental reforms to encourage increased regional cooperation and consolidation of services.
Title
Study; local government fiscal stress; report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103879D |