VA SJR279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the Twenty-First Century continued; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the Twenty-First Century for two additional years, through December 1, 2018.
Title
Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the Twenty-First Century.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101417D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ279E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101417D |