VA SJR311 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Housing and Community Development; permitting processes for broadband deployment and renewable energy construction projects; report. Requests the Department of Housing and Community Development to study the permitting processes in the Commonwealth for broadband deployment and renewable energy construction projects.
Title
DHCD; permitting processes for broadband, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 2-N) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104542D |