VA SJR406 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ406ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of James Walter Rogers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of James Walter Rogers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ406ER)
2019-02-19HouseAgreed to by House
2019-02-18HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2019-02-18HouseReceived
2019-02-18SenateAgreed to by Senate
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-02-13SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-02-13SenatePresented 19105984D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback