VA SJR418 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ418ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ418ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Colonial Behavioral Health.
Title
Commending Colonial Behavioral Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ418ER) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2011-02-04 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2011-02-04 | House: Received | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 11104519D | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Presented 11104519D |