VA SJR443 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ443ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ443ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Travis Brust.
Title
Commending Travis Brust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ443ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2013-02-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2013-02-21 | House | Received |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Presented 13103325D |