VA SJR49 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ49ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ49ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Health Professions; need for additional micro-level, mezzo-level, and macro-level social workers and increased compensation; report. Requests that the Department of Health Professions convene a work group, which shall include certain stakeholders listed in the bill, to (i) identify the number of social workers needed in the Commonwealth to adequately serve the population; (ii) identify opportunities for the Commonwealth's social work workforce to successfully serve and respond to increasing biopsychosocial needs of individuals, groups, and communities in areas related to aging, child welfare, social services, military and veterans affairs, criminal justice, juvenile justice, corrections, mental health, substance abuse treatment, and other health and social determinants; (iii) gather information about current social workers in the Commonwealth related to level of education, school of social work attended, level of licensure, job title and classification, years of experience, gender, employer, and compensation; (iv) analyze the impact of compensation levels on social workers' job satisfaction and performance, as well as its impact on the likelihood of other persons entering the profession and any complications to such compensation levels caused by student debt; and (v) make recommendations for additional sources of funding to adequately compensate social workers and increase the number of social workers in the Commonwealth.
Title
Social workers; DHP to study need for additional, etc., workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (73-Y 23-N) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ49ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (73-Y 23-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Agreed to by House (73-Y 23-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105090D |