VA SJR55 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Rules
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Rules
Summary
Study; teacher shortage; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee to study the teacher shortage in the Commonwealth. In conducting its study, the joint subcommittee shall review current teacher certification and licensure requirements as well as teacher preparation programs in Virginia; examine the effectiveness of existing programs designed to recruit and retain teachers, including Teach for America, and other alternative certification routes; identify barriers to teaching as a career choice and possible solutions; evaluate other states' initiatives aimed at teacher recruitment and retention; and identify incentives for bringing out-of-state teachers to Virginia. This resolution incorporates
Title
Teachers; joint subcommittee to study shortage in State.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Left in Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ55S1 | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 087308256-S1 | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 087308256-S1 | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088228256 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ55 |