VA SR85 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR85ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR85ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Brenda Lee Hansen-Ike.
Title
Celebrating the life of Brenda Lee Hansen-Ike.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate (SR85ER) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/19 19101729D |