VT H0355 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor on 6/6/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor on 6/6/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to licensing and regulating foresters
Title
An act relating to licensing and regulating foresters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor on 6/6/16 |
2016-06-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 6/1/16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-05-04 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-05-04 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) White motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Nitka motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Nitka |
2016-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray; text |
2016-05-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by Senator(s) Bray, Benning, Collamore, Pollina, and White |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, Benning, Collamore, Pollina, and White; text |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Government Operations |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe, Bray, Benning, Collamore, Pollina, and White |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read Third time |
2015-05-05 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2015-05-05 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2015-05-05 | House | Rep. Branagan of Georgia, recommended for the committee on Ways & Means |
2015-05-05 | House | Rep. Cole of Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2015-05-05 | House | Read Second Time |
2015-05-01 | House | Rep. Cole of Burlington moved to postpone action until May 5, 2015 which was agreed to |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a) |
2015-02-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |