VT H0644 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to access to records by individuals who were in foster care
Title
An act relating to access to records by individuals who were in foster care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs agreed to |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-03-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |