VT H0661 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to child abuse and neglect investigation and substantiation standards and procedures
Title
An act relating to child abuse and neglect investigation and substantiation standards and procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-21 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-20 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. Garofano of Essex reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2024-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-05 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |