VT H0741 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-8)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Signed by Governor on April 25, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-8)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Signed by Governor on April 25, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to health insurance coverage for colorectal cancer screening
Title
An act relating to health insurance coverage for colorectal cancer screening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor on April 25, 2024 |
2024-04-19 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Gulick for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Goldman of Rockingham reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2024-03-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-11 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |