VT H0795 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Victim's Compensation And Restitution Procedures
Title
An Act Relating To Victim's Compensation And Restitution Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 10, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-11 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-03-11 | House | Rep. Fagan of Rutland City reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-11 | House | Rep. Fay of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |