VT H0862 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Barre
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Barre
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2024-04-03 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-04-02 | House | Rep. Waters Evans of Charlotte reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-04-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-29 | House | Rep. Waters Evans of Charlotte moved to postpone action until 4/02/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-03-29 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-28 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-02-27 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |