VT H0887 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 Senate Committee on Finance Hearing
Hearing: May 2 Senate Committee on Education Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 Senate Committee on Finance Hearing
Hearing: May 2 Senate Committee on Education Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to homestead property tax yields, nonhomestead rates, and policy changes to education finance and taxation
Title
An act relating to homestead property tax yields, nonhomestead rates, and policy changes to education finance and taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 101, Nays = 39 (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 38 (Y: 94 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 100 (Y: 41 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 39, Nays = 104 (Y: 39 N: 104 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 38 (Y: 94 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 100 (Y: 41 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 39, Nays = 104 (Y: 39 N: 104 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed |
2024-04-24 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 101, Nays = 39 |
2024-04-24 | House | Rep. Toof of St. Albans Town demanded yeas and nays |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time |
2024-04-24 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-04-23 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 38 |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Holcombe of Norwich asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Holcombe of Norwich moved to amend the bill |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Toleno of Brattleboro asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Toleno of Brattleboro, Arsenault of Williston, Burrows of West Windsor, Carpenter of Hyde Park, Dolan of Waitsfield, Goldman of Rockingham, Graning of Jericho, Holcombe of Norwich, and Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Carpenter of Hyde Park asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Carpenter of Hyde Park, Arsenault of Williston, Burrows of West Windsor, Chapin of East Montpelier, Christie of Hartford, Cole of Hartford, Cordes of Lincoln, Dolan of Waitsfield, Goldman of Rockingham, Graning of Jericho, Headrick of Burlington, Holcombe of Norwich, Krasnow of South Burlington, LaMont of Morristown, Leavitt of Grand Isle, Lipsky of Stowe, McGill of Bridport, Ode of Burlington, Roberts of Halifax, and Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the bill, which was disagreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover, Arsenault of Williston, Burrows of West Windsor, Carpenter of Hyde Park, and Graning of Jericho moved to amend the bill |
2024-04-23 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 100 |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Toof of St. Albans Town demanded yeas and nays |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Toof of St. Albans Town and Taylor of Milton moved to amend the bill |
2024-04-23 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 39, Nays = 104 |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Shaw of Pittsford moved to amend the bill |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury moved to amend the bill, which was disagreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro spoke for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-04-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-23 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-04-22 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-04-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee bill read first time |