VT HCR183 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House concurrent resolution designating March 28, 2024 as Alzheimer’s Awareness Day at the State House
Title
House concurrent resolution designating March 28, 2024 as Alzheimer’s Awareness Day at the State House
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Ceremonial Reading |
2024-03-22 | House | Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b |
2024-03-22 | House | Senate Message: Adopted in concurrence |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b |
2024-03-22 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2024-03-21 | House | On Consent Calendar |