VT S0003 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Signed by Governor on June 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Signed by Governor on June 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to sexual exploitation of students
Title
An act relating to sexual exploitation of students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 13, 2018 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-30 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-30 | House | Rep. Webb of Shelburne reported for the committee on Education |
2018-05-30 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-30 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Committee bill read first time; pending entry on notice calendar, rules suspended on motion of Senator Ashe & taken up for immediate consideration |