VT S0064 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 29, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 29, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Growth Center Designations And Appeals Of Such Designations
Title
An Act Relating To Growth Center Designations And Appeals Of Such Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on May 29, 2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-06 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-06 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2010-05-06 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-05 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-04 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-04 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-03 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-05-03 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 64 of 126 to Pass -- Yeas = 125, Nays = 1 | |
2010-05-03 | Rep. Nease of Johnson demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-05-03 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2010-05-03 | Rep. Jerman of Essex reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2010-05-03 | Read Second Time | |
2010-03-23 | Committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy by motion of Rep. Klein of East Montpelier | |
2010-03-23 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-03-19 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-03-19 | As passed by Senate | |
2010-03-19 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-03-19 | Floor amendment by Senator Miller and Snelling agreed to | |
2010-03-19 | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Miller and Snelling | |
2010-03-19 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Miller and Snelling | |
2010-03-19 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2010-03-18 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-03-17 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-03-17 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2010-03-17 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2010-03-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2009-02-06 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |