VT S0073 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 23, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 23, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Raising The Penalties For Eluding A Police Officer
Title
An Act Relating To Raising The Penalties For Eluding A Police Officer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on May 23, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to Governor on May 17, 2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-05-02 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2011-05-02 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-05-02 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-05-02 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-27 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2011-04-27 | Rep. Rep. Waite-Simpson of Essex reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-27 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-02-25 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-02-24 | Title to bill amended by Secretary, per Senate Rule 40 | |
2011-02-24 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-02-24 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2011-02-24 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-02-24 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-24 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Snelling for Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-02-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2011-02-23 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |