VT S0096 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the provision of water quality services
Title
An act relating to the provision of water quality services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 5 (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 126, Nays = 14 (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 14 (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 126, Nays = 14 (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 14 (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 13, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2019-05-22 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 5 |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Cummings and Bray |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Cummings and Bray; text |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings and Bray |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 126, Nays = 14 |
2019-05-10 | House | Read Third time |
2019-05-10 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Sibilia of Dover disagreed to |
2019-05-10 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock disagreed to |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-09 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 14 |
2019-05-09 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife as amended agreed to |
2019-05-09 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2019-05-09 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Sheldon of Middlebury, Bates of Bennington, Dolan of Waitsfield, Lefebvre of Newark, McCullough of Williston, Ode of Burlington, Smith of New Haven, Squirrell of Underhill, and Terenzini of Rutland Town moved to amend the report of the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the report of the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2019-05-09 | House | Report of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Ancel of Calais recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-09 | House | Rep. Sheldon of Middlebury reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2019-05-09 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-04-04 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as moved by Senator Bray and Starr |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Bray and Starr, text |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Pending Question: Shall the bill be amended as recommended by the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended?? |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Consideration postponed; Second reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Bray |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Pending Question: Shall the bill be amended as recommended by the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended?? |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Consideration interrupted by adjournment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |