VT S0114 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the establishment of the Psychedelic Therapy Advisory Working Group
Title
An act relating to the establishment of the Psychedelic Therapy Advisory Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Gulick for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |