VT S0149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Signed by Governor on February 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Signed by Governor on February 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the authority of the Department of Forests, Parks and Recreation to enter into land transactions
Title
An act relating to the authority of the Department of Forests, Parks and Recreation to enter into land transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on February 28, 2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-01-25 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2018-01-24 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2018-01-23 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-01-23 | House | Rep. Macaig of Williston reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2018-01-23 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-01-09 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-01-05 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |