VT S0183 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield moved that the bill be committed to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs, which was agreed to
Pending: House Government Operations and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield moved that the bill be committed to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs, which was agreed to
Pending: House Government Operations and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to reenvisioning the Agency of Human Services
Title
An act relating to reenvisioning the Agency of Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield moved that the bill be committed to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs, which was agreed to |
2024-04-10 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-04-09 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |