VT S0196 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - As passed by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - As passed by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the types of evidence permitted in weight of the evidence hearings
Title
An act relating to the types of evidence permitted in weight of the evidence hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2024-05-03 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence |
2024-05-01 | House | Read third time and passed in concurrence |
2024-05-01 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-04-30 | House | Rep. Notte of Rutland City reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-30 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-04-29 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-04-26 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-21 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hashim for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |