VT S0213 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the regulation of wetlands, river corridor development, and dam safety
Title
An act relating to the regulation of wetlands, river corridor development, and dam safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Rule 31 suspended and bill not referred to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Cummings |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |